ID HCR062 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:42 a.m. on March 25, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:42 a.m. on March 25, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Governor and the Attorney General enter into negotiations with the Coeur d'Alene Tribe and the United States to resolve its federal reserved water right claims, if possible.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Governor and the Attorney General enter into negotiations with the Coeur d'Alene Tribe and the United States to resolve its federal reserved water right claims, if possible.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:42 a.m. on March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Nonini |
2014-03-20 | Senate | voice vote Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | ADOPTED |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-19 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-19 | House | Barbieri |
2014-03-19 | House | 67-0-3 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Bateman, Henderson, Thompson Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-19 | House | ADOPTED |
2014-03-19 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read three times |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |