ID HCR039 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - U.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - U.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and instructing the Department of Health and Welfare to investigate the creation of a hospital discharge database and an all payer claims database and to establish an advisory committee to create a plan for such databases.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and instructing the Department of Health and Welfare to investigate the creation of a hospital discharge database and an all payer claims database and to establish an advisory committee to create a plan for such databases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | U.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee |
2014-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 24, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 24, 2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-02-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/HCR039.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/HCR039.pdf |