ID HCR037 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:16 a.m. on January 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:16 a.m. on January 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear the Governor's State of the State Address.
Title
Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear the Governor's State of the State Address.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Moyle [R] | Rep. John Rusche [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:16 a.m. on January 10, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-01-08 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-01-07 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-01-06 | Senate | to House |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Davis |
2014-01-06 | Senate | voice vote Floor Sponsor |
2014-01-06 | Senate | ADOPTED |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-01-06 | House | to Senate |
2014-01-06 | House | Title apvd |
2014-01-06 | House | Moyle |
2014-01-06 | House | voice vote Floor Sponsor |
2014-01-06 | House | ADOPTED |
2014-01-06 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 61 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 9, read three times |
2014-01-06 | House | Reported Printed and Held at Desk |
2014-01-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/HCR037.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/HCR037.pdf |