ID HCR036 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
Pending: Senate Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
Pending: Senate Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RULE APPROVAL -- HOUSE RESOURCES AND CONSERVATION COMMITTEE -- States findings of the Legislature and approves pending rules of the Idaho Department of Lands reviewed by the House Resources and Conservation Committee, with an exception.
Title
States findings of the Legislature and approves pending rules of the Idaho Department of Lands reviewed by the House Resources and Conservation Committee, with an exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-15 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-15 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 68-0-2 |
2024-03-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |