ID HCR033 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:02 a.m. on February 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DEPARTMENT OF FISH AND GAME -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Fish and Game relating to Rules Governing the Taking of Big Game Animals in the State of Idaho.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Fish and Game relating to Rules Governing the Taking of Big Game Animals in the State of Idaho.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 11:02 a.m. on February 27, 2018
2018-02-27HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-02-26SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-02-26SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-02-23HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-02-22HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-02-21Senateto House
2018-02-21SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-21SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-02-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2018-02-14SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-13Houseto Senate
2018-02-13HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-13HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 69-0-1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-09HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-31HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2018-01-30HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback