ID HCR021 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DIVISION OF BUILDING SAFETY -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Division of Building Safety relating to Idaho Minimum Safety Standards and Practices for Logging, Recommended Safety Program.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Division of Building Safety relating to Idaho Minimum Safety Standards and Practices for Logging, Recommended Safety Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-03 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-03 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 66-0-4 |
2017-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |