ID HCR005 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:47 a.m. on March 8, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:47 a.m. on March 8, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and commemorating the Idaho Territorial Sesquicentennial and providing that the Legislative Auditorium be named the Abraham Lincoln Auditorium.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and commemorating the Idaho Territorial Sesquicentennial and providing that the Legislative Auditorium be named the Abraham Lincoln Auditorium.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:47 a.m. on March 8, 2013 |
2013-03-08 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-06 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-05 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-04 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-04 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read in full |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-01-30 | House | to Senate |
2013-01-30 | House | Title apvd |
2013-01-30 | House | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2013-01-30 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-01-28 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2013-01-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2013/HCR005.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2013/HCR005.pdf |