ID HCR003 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:13 a.m. on March 9, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:13 a.m. on March 9, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION - Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the state's elementary, secondary and postsecondary longitudinal data systems.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the state's elementary, secondary and postsecondary longitudinal data systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:13 a.m. on March 9, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-03 | Senate | ADOPTED -- 32-0-2 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read in full |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-02-13 | House | to Senate |
2015-02-13 | House | Title apvd |
2015-02-13 | House | ADOPTED -- 63-4-3 |
2015-02-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |