ID H0782 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 25 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - U.C. to be Held at Desk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 25 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - U.C. to be Held at Desk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE JUDICIARY -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding membership of and appointments to the Judicial Council, to revise provisions regarding duties of the Judicial Council, and to revise provisions regarding the salaries of judges.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding membership of and appointments to the Judicial Council, to revise provisions regarding duties of the Judicial Council, and to revise provisions regarding the salaries of judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | U.C. to be Held at Desk |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned from Governor vetoed on March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:25 p.m. on March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 26-9-0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-18 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-18 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-18 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported out of Committee without Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2022-03-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |