ID H0692 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding identification for voter registration and voting purposes.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding identification for voter registration and voting purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee |
2022-03-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |