ID H0663 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - U.C. to be returned to Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - U.C. to be returned to Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SCHOOLS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding threatening school violence and to provide that certain acts shall be a felony.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding threatening school violence and to provide that certain acts shall be a felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | U.C. to be returned to Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0663/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0663.pdf |