ID H0622 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES -- Adds to existing law to provide that, except as otherwise permitted by the First Amendment to the United States Constitution, no public institution of higher education shall abridge the constitutional freedom of any individual to speak on campus.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that, except as otherwise permitted by the First Amendment to the United States Constitution, no public institution of higher education shall abridge the constitutional freedom of any individual to speak on campus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-03-02 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-02 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2018-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |