ID H0609 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WORKER'S COMPENSATION -- Amends existing law to define a public employer and a public corporation with respect to certain requirements regarding security for compensation.
Title
Amends existing law to define a public employer and a public corporation with respect to certain requirements regarding security for compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2024-03-04 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2024-03-04 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |