ID H0598 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 115 Effective: 03/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 115 Effective: 03/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide that a retired member who, subsequent to becoming a disability retiree, serves on any state board or commission that is statutorily required to meet once per month or less, and who is not an employee as defined in the public employment retirement system law by virtue of such service, shall not be deemed to have ceased to be disabled because of such service.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a retired member who, subsequent to becoming a disability retiree, serves on any state board or commission that is statutorily required to meet once per month or less, and who is not an employee as defined in the public employment retirement system law by virtue of such service, shall not be deemed to have ceased to be disabled because of such service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 115 Effective: 03/23/12 | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/21 | |
2012-03-21 | To Governor | |
2012-03-20 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-19 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-16 | To enrol | |
2012-03-15 | to House | |
2012-03-15 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-15 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-02 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-02 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-01 | to Senate | |
2012-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 66-0-4 | |
2012-02-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-28 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-27 | to printing | |
2012-02-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-27 | House intro |