ID H0593 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2014 Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2014 Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and adds to existing law to create the Tax Relief Fund and to provide for the remittance of certain sales tax moneys to the Tax Relief Fund by the State Tax Commission.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to create the Tax Relief Fund and to provide for the remittance of certain sales tax moneys to the Tax Relief Fund by the State Tax Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2014 Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | to enrol |
2014-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | House | Clow |
2014-03-20 | House | 36-34-0 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderst, Bell, Bolz, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Kauffman, Kloc, Malek, McDonald, Meline, Morse, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Smith, VanOrden, Wills, Wood(27), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Anderson(31), Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Boyle, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Gannon, Gestrin, Harris, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, King, Loertscher, Luker, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nielsen, Palmer, Shepherd, Sims, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, Vander Woude, Wood(35) Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 70 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 0, read three times |
2014-03-20 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2014-03-20 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2014-03-20 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2014-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Goedde |
2014-03-20 | Senate | 32-1-2 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- Johnson Absent and excused -- Bock, Brackett Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-11 | House | Clow |
2014-03-11 | House | 41-27-2 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Bell, Bolz, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Dayley, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gibbs, Hartgen, Kauffman, Kloc, Malek, McDonald, Meline, Miller, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Smith, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Woodings, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Anderson(31), Barbieri, Barrett, Batt, Boyle, Crane, DeMordaunt, Denney, Gannon, Gestrin, Hancey, Harris, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, King, Loertscher, Luker, McMillan, Mendive, Monks, Nielsen, Palmer, Shepherd, Sims, Stevenson, Wood(35) Absent -- Henderson, Youngblood Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-11 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-11 | House | Reconsidered |
2014-03-10 | House | U.C. to be returned to 3rd Reading |
2014-03-10 | House | motion carried |
2014-03-10 | House | Motion to reconsider |
2014-03-10 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2014-03-10 | House | Clow |
2014-03-10 | House | 34-36-0 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Bell, Burgoyne, Clow, Collins, Dayley, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Kauffman, Kloc, Malek, McDonald, Morse, Moyle, Raybould, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Smith, Thompson, Trujillo, Vander Woude, Wood(27), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Anderson(31), Barbieri, Barrett, Batt, Bolz, Boyle, Chew, Crane, DeMordaunt, Denney, Gannon, Gestrin, Harris, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, King, Loertscher, Luker, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Ringo, Shepherd, Sims, Stevenson, VanOrden, Wills, Wood(35) Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-10 | House | FAILED |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2014-03-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2014-03-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |