ID H0588 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Take bill off General Orders; referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Take bill off General Orders; referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SCHOOLS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding threatening school violence and to provide that certain acts shall be a felony.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding threatening school violence and to provide that certain acts shall be a felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Take bill off General Orders; referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-02-23 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0588/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0588.pdf |