ID H0569 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 185 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 185 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise a provision relating to the description of controlled substances.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a provision relating to the description of controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 185 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/23 | |
2012-03-23 | To Governor | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-21 | To enrol | |
2012-03-20 | to House | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-15 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-06 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-03-06 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-06 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-05 | to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-05 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2012-03-01 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-29 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-23 | Ref'd to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-23 | Ret'd to Desk for re-referral | |
2012-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-21 | to St Aff | |
2012-02-21 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-20 | to printing | |
2012-02-20 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-20 | House intro |