ID H0566 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Returned from Governor vetoed on March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to establish provisions regarding certificates for charter school administrators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to establish provisions regarding certificates for charter school administrators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseReturned from Governor vetoed on March 28, 2018
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:18 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-22Houseto enrol
2018-03-22HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-22HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-22HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-21HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-21HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2018-03-21HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2018-03-21HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2018-03-21HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence; objection
2018-03-20HouseReferred to Education for concurrence recommendation
2018-03-20HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2018-03-19Senateto House
2018-03-19SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-19SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 23-10-2
2018-03-16SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2018-03-15SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-15SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-03-15SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2018-03-15SenateAmendments ordered printed
2018-03-15SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-03-14SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-03-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2018-03-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-01Houseto Senate
2018-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-01HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-23HouseU.C. to be returned to Education Committee
2018-02-23HouseReported out of Committee without Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback