ID H0557 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMERCIAL TRANSACTIONS -- Amends existing law to require regulated lenders and payday lenders to use an electronic system of licensing.
Title
Amends existing law to require regulated lenders and payday lenders to use an electronic system of licensing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2022-02-23 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 31-38-1 |
2022-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |