ID H0536 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 358 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 358 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HIGHWAYS - Amends existing law to provide that either party to a proceeding may request appointment of a judge who is not a resident of the county where a subject road or property is located.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that either party to a proceeding may request appointment of a judge who is not a resident of the county where a subject road or property is located.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 358 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 10:36 p.m. on March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-23 | House | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-23 | House | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-17 | House | to House |
2016-03-17 | House | No motion for reconsideration received |
2016-03-17 | House | Held at Desk |
2016-03-17 | House | Notice to reconsider |
2016-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-17 | Senate | PASSED -- 30-5-0 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-10 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-10 | House | Loertscher |
2016-03-10 | House | 56-11-3 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Loertscher, Luker, Malek(Chadderdon), McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rudolph, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Chew, Erpelding, Gannon, Jordan, Kloc, McCrostie, Nye, Pence, Rubel, Rusche, Wintrow Absent -- Beyeler, Harris, Wood Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-10 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 66 Nays 1 Abs/Excd 3, read three times |
2016-03-10 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2016-02-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |