ID H0535 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- SOIL AND WATER CONSERVATION COMMISSION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Soil and Water Conservation Commission for fiscal year 2021.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Soil and Water Conservation Commission for fiscal year 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reconsidered -- FAILED 29-39-2 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Armstrong, Crane |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Absent |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Abernathy, Amador, Anderson, Anderst, Berch, Blanksma, Chew, Collins, Davis, Dixon, Ellis, Furniss, Gannon, Goesling, Green, Hartgen, Horman, Kauffman, Lickley, Mason, McCrostie, Moon, Necochea, Raybould(Erickson), Remington, Rubel, Smith, Syme, Toone, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Addis, Andrus, Barbieri, Boyle, Chaney, Christensen, Clow, DeMordaunt, Ehardt, Gestrin, Gibbs, Giddings, Harris, Holtzclaw, Kerby, Kingsley, Kiska, Marshall, Mendive, Monks, Moyle, Nichols, Palmer, Raymond, Ricks, Scott, Shepherd, Stevenson, Troy, Vander Woude, Wagoner, Wisniewski, Young, Zito, Zollinger, Mr. Speaker NAYS |
2020-02-27 | Senate | PASSED 36-32-2 AYES |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Motion to reconsider |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Held at Desk |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Notice to reconsider |
2020-02-27 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 37-30-3 |
2020-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |