ID H0532 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2022 Session Law Chapter 73 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2022 Session Law Chapter 73 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Adds to and amends existing law to allow the Secretary of State or a county clerk to petition for judicial review of an election when it appears that an error occurred in the administration of the election and the error might be sufficient to change the outcome of the election.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to allow the Secretary of State or a county clerk to petition for judicial review of an election when it appears that an error occurred in the administration of the election and the error might be sufficient to change the outcome of the election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2022 Session Law Chapter 73 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on March 16, 2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-02-23 | House | to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Title apvd |
2022-02-23 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2022-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |