ID H0510 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INCOME TAXES -- Amends existing law regarding the treatment of state and local taxation for affected business entities.
Title
Amends existing law regarding the treatment of state and local taxation for affected business entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-02-14 | House | to Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | Title apvd |
2022-02-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2022-02-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 14, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |