ID H0496 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 246 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 246 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and adds to existing law relating to elections to provide that each elector shall show a photo identification or personal identification affidavit, to provide that all voters shall be required to provide certain personal identification at the polls or at the absent elector polling places; and to provide for an affidavit in lieu of personal identification.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law relating to elections to provide that each elector shall show a photo identification or personal identification affidavit, to provide that all voters shall be required to provide certain personal identification at the polls or at the absent elector polling places; and to provide for an affidavit in lieu of personal identification.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 246 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-26 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-26 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-25 | To enrol | |
2010-03-24 | to House | |
2010-03-24 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 27-6-2 | |
2010-03-19 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-18 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-18 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-02 | to St Aff | |
2010-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-02 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-01 | to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 64-6-0 | |
2010-02-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-23 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-10 | to St Aff | |
2010-02-10 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-09 | to printing | |
2010-02-09 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-09 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0496.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0496.pdf |