ID H0485 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 202 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 202 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise the eligibility criteria for taking a state income tax deduction for installing energy efficiency upgrade measures within existing residences to qualify for a state income tax deduction.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the eligibility criteria for taking a state income tax deduction for installing energy efficiency upgrade measures within existing residences to qualify for a state income tax deduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 202 Effective: 01/01/12 | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/28 | |
2012-03-28 | To Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-27 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-26 | To enrol | |
2012-03-26 | to House | |
2012-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 31-4-0 | |
2012-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-01 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-01 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-29 | to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-29 | Jaquet & Vander Woude | |
2012-02-29 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 AYES -- Anderson(Keough), Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Block(Block), Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Black, Henderson, Lake, McGeachin, Patrick Floor Sponsors | |
2012-02-28 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt engros | |
2012-02-24 | to engros | |
2012-02-24 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-02-16 | to Gen Ord | |
2012-02-16 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-08 | to Rev/Tax | |
2012-02-08 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-07 | to printing | |
2012-02-07 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-07 | House intro |