ID H0473 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RESTORING CONSTITUTIONAL GOVERNANCE ACT OF IDAHO -- Adds to existing law to provide legislative determination and to provide for the prohibition on the detention and disposition of Idaho citizens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide legislative determination and to provide for the prohibition on the detention and disposition of Idaho citizens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-02-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-26Houseto Senate
2018-02-26HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 63-4-3
2018-02-23HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018
2018-02-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-01HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback