ID H0473 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - U.C. to be returned to Resources & Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - U.C. to be returned to Resources & Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to declare certain federal regulation authority is not authorized by the United States Constitution, to state the legislative duty to prevent enforcement of certain regulations and to provide exceptions.
Title
Amends existing law to declare certain federal regulation authority is not authorized by the United States Constitution, to state the legislative duty to prevent enforcement of certain regulations and to provide exceptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | U.C. to be returned to Resources & Conservation Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | 03/18 Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/H0473.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/H0473.pdf |