ID H0462 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

FORCIBLE ENTRY AND UNLAWFUL DETAINER -- Adds to and amends existing law to provide certain requirements for a landlord and to provide a certain requirement for a security deposit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to and amends existing law to provide certain requirements for a landlord and to provide a certain requirement for a security deposit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2020-03-19HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2020-03-18HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2020-03-18HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2020-03-18HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2020-03-18HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2020-03-13HouseRetained on General Orders
2020-03-02HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders
2020-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 2, 2020
2020-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-02-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-24HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-02-11HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback