ID H0450 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUDGETS -- Amends existing law to provide that a taxing district wishing to disclaim the right to recover a forgone budget increase shall provide notice, hold a hearing and adopt a resolution, a copy of which shall go to the county clerk and the State Tax Commission.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a taxing district wishing to disclaim the right to recover a forgone budget increase shall provide notice, hold a hearing and adopt a resolution, a copy of which shall go to the county clerk and the State Tax Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-12 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-12 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 56-13-1 |
2018-02-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 12, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |