ID H0403 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2024 Session Law Chapter 39 Effective: 03/14/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2024 Session Law Chapter 39 Effective: 03/14/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SOIL CONSERVATION DISTRICTS -- Amends existing law to establish provisions regarding a reduction in the number of supervisors and to revise provisions regarding terms of office, the filling of vacancies, and quorums.
Title
Amends existing law to establish provisions regarding a reduction in the number of supervisors and to revise provisions regarding terms of office, the filling of vacancies, and quorums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2024 Session Law Chapter 39 Effective: 03/14/2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-03-13 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | to enrol |
2024-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2024-03-12 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2024-03-11 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2024-03-11 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2024-03-11 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Agricultural Affairs for concurrence recommendation |
2024-03-07 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2024-03-06 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-02-14 | House | to Senate |
2024-02-14 | House | Title apvd |
2024-02-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-13-3 |
2024-02-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-02-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-02-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 12, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-01-19 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |