ID H0394 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 37 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 37 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to the Interstate Agreement on Qualifications of Educational Personnel, to revise provisions relating to purpose, to provide for assumptions, to provide definitions, to establish provisions relating to duties of member jurisdictions, to establish provisions relating to procedures for member participation and to establish and revise provisions relating to other aspects of the interstate agreement.
Title
Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to the Interstate Agreement on Qualifications of Educational Personnel, to revise provisions relating to purpose, to provide for assumptions, to provide definitions, to establish provisions relating to duties of member jurisdictions, to establish provisions relating to procedures for member participation and to establish and revise provisions relating to other aspects of the interstate agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 37 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/02 | |
2012-03-02 | To Governor | |
2012-03-01 | Pres signed | |
2012-02-29 | Sp signed | |
2012-02-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-02-28 | To enrol | |
2012-02-27 | to House | |
2012-02-27 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-27 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-0 | |
2012-02-13 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-13 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-10 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-08 | to Educ | |
2012-02-08 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-08 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-07 | to Senate | |
2012-02-07 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-07 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-0-2 | |
2012-02-06 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-06 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-03 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-03 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-23 | to Educ | |
2012-01-23 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-20 | to printing | |
2012-01-20 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-20 | House intro |