ID H0386 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 178 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 178 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to scholarships to revise provisions relating to eligibility of a scholarship of a spouse or child, to establish provisions relating to eligibility for a scholarship for a child of a military member, to establish provisions relating to eligibility for a scholarship for a spouse of a military member, to revise provisions relating to an individual who receives a scholarship, to revise provisions relating to educational qualifications, to revise terminology, to revise provisions relating to certain benefits, to revise provisions relating to members of the armed forces, to provide for rules and to revise provisions relating to scholarships for the spouse or child of a public safety officer.
Title
Amends existing law relating to scholarships to revise provisions relating to eligibility of a scholarship of a spouse or child, to establish provisions relating to eligibility for a scholarship for a child of a military member, to establish provisions relating to eligibility for a scholarship for a spouse of a military member, to revise provisions relating to an individual who receives a scholarship, to revise provisions relating to educational qualifications, to revise terminology, to revise provisions relating to certain benefits, to revise provisions relating to members of the armed forces, to provide for rules and to revise provisions relating to scholarships for the spouse or child of a public safety officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 178 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/23 | |
2012-03-23 | To Governor | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-21 | To enrol | |
2012-03-20 | to House | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-03-14 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-13 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-01 | to Educ | |
2012-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-01 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-29 | to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-29 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 64-0-6 | |
2012-02-28 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt engros | |
2012-02-24 | to engros | |
2012-02-24 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-02-07 | To Gen Ord | |
2012-02-07 | U.C. to reconsider | |
2012-02-06 | Held at Desk | |
2012-02-06 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-06 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 61-8-1 | |
2012-02-03 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-03 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-02 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-02 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-02 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-20 | to Educ | |
2012-01-20 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-19 | to printing | |
2012-01-19 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-19 | House intro |