ID H0371 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 342 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

FACTORY BUILT STRUCTURES - Amends existing law to redesignate the Modular Building Advisory Board as the Factory Built Structures Advisory Board and to provide that the board shall have certain powers and duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to redesignate the Modular Building Advisory Board as the Factory Built Structures Advisory Board and to provide that the board shall have certain powers and duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-05HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 342 Effective: 07/01/2016
2016-03-25HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 28, 2016
2016-03-25HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-25SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2016-03-25SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2016-03-25HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2016-03-24Houseto enrol
2016-03-24HouseTitle apvd
2016-03-24HouseThompson
2016-03-24House67-0-3 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Bateman, Kloc, Rubel Floor Sponsor
2016-03-24HousePASSED
2016-03-24HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read three times
2016-03-24HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2016-03-23HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2016-03-23HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2016-03-22HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2016-03-22HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2016-03-22HouseReturned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk
2016-03-21Senateto House
2016-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2016-03-21SenatePASSED -- 35-0-0
2016-03-21SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate
2016-03-18SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2016-03-17SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2016-03-17SenateAmendments reported printed
2016-03-17SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2016-03-17SenateAmendments ordered printed
2016-03-17SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2016-03-10SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2016-02-08SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2016-02-05Houseto Senate
2016-02-05HouseTitle apvd
2016-02-05HousePASSED -- 70-0-0
2016-02-05HouseRead Third Time in Full
2016-02-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2016-02-03HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2016-02-02HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2016-01-25HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2016-01-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback