ID H0355 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Section 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Section 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IDAHO OFFICE OF EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT - Amends existing law to change the name of the Bureau of Homeland Security to the Idaho Office of Emergency Management.
Title
Amends existing law to change the name of the Bureau of Homeland Security to the Idaho Office of Emergency Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Section 20 |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 22, 2016 Session Law Chapter 118 Effective: 07/01/2016; 12/31/2018 Sunset Clause |
2016-03-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on March 16, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-10 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-12 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-12 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-12 | House | PASSED -- 65-0-5 |
2016-02-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-10 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-01-22 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |