ID H0355 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to update references to the Internal Revenue Code for state income tax purposes.
Title
Amends existing law to update references to the Internal Revenue Code for state income tax purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: 01/01/12 | |
2012-02-03 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 02/02 | |
2012-02-02 | To Governor | |
2012-02-01 | Pres signed | |
2012-01-31 | Sp signed | |
2012-01-31 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-01-30 | To enrol | |
2012-01-27 | to House | |
2012-01-27 | Title apvd | |
2012-01-27 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-0-3 | |
2012-01-26 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-01-26 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-25 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-25 | rec d/p | |
2012-01-25 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-18 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-01-18 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-18 | Senate intro | |
2012-01-17 | to Senate | |
2012-01-17 | Title apvd | |
2012-01-17 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2012-01-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-01-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-13 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-13 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-12 | to printing | |
2012-01-12 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-12 | House intro |