ID H0314 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TRANSPORTATION -- Amends existing law to increase funding for state and local transportation through sales tax and adjustments to the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation program.
Title
Amends existing law to increase funding for state and local transportation through sales tax and adjustments to the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |