ID H0298 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Retained on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Retained on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMES AND PUNISHMENT -- Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise a provision regarding interstate trafficking in prostitution, to provide for the crime of receiving proceeds of illegal sexual activity, and to provide for human trafficking victim protection.
Title
Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise a provision regarding interstate trafficking in prostitution, to provide for the crime of receiving proceeds of illegal sexual activity, and to provide for human trafficking victim protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2023-03-20 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2023-03-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2023-03-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |