ID H0244 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
NATUROPATHIC MEDICINE -- Establishes provisions regarding the licensure of naturopathic medical doctors.
Title
Establishes provisions regarding the licensure of naturopathic medical doctors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 25, 2019 |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-2-1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-08 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-08 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-3-3 |
2019-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |