ID H0229 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 28, 2021 Session Law Chapter 295 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 28, 2021 Session Law Chapter 295 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
TRANSPORTATION -- Amends existing law to increase fees for snowmobile use, to allocate such funds, and to establish a state snowmobile avalanche fund.
Title
Amends existing law to increase fees for snowmobile use, to allocate such funds, and to establish a state snowmobile avalanche fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 28, 2021 Session Law Chapter 295 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-04-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:20 p.m. on April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | to enrol |
2021-04-26 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-26 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 40-28-2 |
2021-04-26 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 26, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-21 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2021-04-19 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2021-04-19 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2021-04-15 | House | U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Transportation & Defense for concurrence recommendation |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2021-04-12 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 26-8-1 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2021-03-01 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 38-31-1 |
2021-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |