ID H0221 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2015 Session Law Chapter 225 Effective: 04/02/2015 and applied retroactively to any case under audit or in which a timely protest has been filed as of the date of this act's passage and approval
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2015 Session Law Chapter 225 Effective: 04/02/2015 and applied retroactively to any case under audit or in which a timely protest has been filed as of the date of this act's passage and approval
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAX EXEMPTION - WILDLIFE COSTS - Amends existing law to provide that the costs of acquiring, feeding, caring for and maintaining wildlife or fish available for hunting or fishing are eligible for the production exemption when the hunting or fishing activity is taxable.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the costs of acquiring, feeding, caring for and maintaining wildlife or fish available for hunting or fishing are eligible for the production exemption when the hunting or fishing activity is taxable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2015 Session Law Chapter 225 Effective: 04/02/2015 and applied retroactively to any case under audit or in which a timely protest has been filed as of the date of this act's passage and approval |
2015-03-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:58 a.m. on March 27, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-24 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-12 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2015-03-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |