ID H0219 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide certain prohibited acts regarding firearms by public employees and officers of governmental entities, to provide penalties and to establish that certain laws are unenforceable in Idaho by state and local government officials, agents or employees.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide certain prohibited acts regarding firearms by public employees and officers of governmental entities, to provide penalties and to establish that certain laws are unenforceable in Idaho by state and local government officials, agents or employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-11 | House | PASSED -- 55-13-2 |
2013-03-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2013 |
2013-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-06 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-27 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2013-02-26 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |