ID H0188 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
REVISED UNCLAIMED PROPERTY ACT -- Repeals and adds to existing law to enact the Revised Unclaimed Property Act.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law to enact the Revised Unclaimed Property Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-03-21 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-21 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-21 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2023-03-20 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2023-03-20 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2023-02-23 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |