ID H0186 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2019 Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 03/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2019 Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 03/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- DIVISION OF VETERANS SERVICES -- Relates to the appropriation to the Division of Veterans Services for fiscal year 2019.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Division of Veterans Services for fiscal year 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2019 Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 03/18/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:10 a.m. on March 18, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-4 |
2019-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-25 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |