ID H0169 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE PLANNING AND COORDINATION -- Amends existing law to provide for certain agency performance measures.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for certain agency performance measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-03-08 | House | to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Title apvd |
2021-03-08 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 69-1-0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |