ID H0164 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TRANSPORTATION -- Amends existing law to provide that local jurisdictions shall not have authority to regulate off-highway vehicle traffic on sections of highway under their jurisdiction.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that local jurisdictions shall not have authority to regulate off-highway vehicle traffic on sections of highway under their jurisdiction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |