ID H0140 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 178 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 178 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to the Juvenile Corrections Act to provide for a certain examination to determine competency to proceed, to provide for the appointment of psychiatrists, psychologists and evaluation committees, to provide for hospitalization and to require certain reports; to provide for a hearing to determine whether a juvenile is competent to proceed, to provide for the suspension of proceedings, to provide for certain court orders and to provide a process to restore competency to proceed; to require that certain reports be filed within specified time frames and to require a certain review hearing be held within a specified time frame; to provide that certain statements are not admissible in certain proceedings and to provide an exception.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to the Juvenile Corrections Act to provide for a certain examination to determine competency to proceed, to provide for the appointment of psychiatrists, psychologists and evaluation committees, to provide for hospitalization and to require certain reports; to provide for a hearing to determine whether a juvenile is competent to proceed, to provide for the suspension of proceedings, to provide for certain court orders and to provide a process to restore competency to proceed; to require that certain reports be filed within specified time frames and to require a certain review hearing be held within a specified time frame; to provide that certain statements are not admissible in certain proceedings and to provide an exception.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 178 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-05 | Delivered to Governor on 04/04 | |
2011-04-04 | To Governor | |
2011-04-01 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-31 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-31 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-30 | to enrol | |
2011-03-30 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-30 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 60-7-3 | |
2011-03-29 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2011-03-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-28 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2011-03-28 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-28 | Rpt engros | |
2011-03-25 | to engros | |
2011-03-25 | House concurred in Senate amens | |
2011-03-25 | House Held at Desk | |
2011-03-24 | to House | |
2011-03-24 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-24 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-17 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2011-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2011-03-16 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-15 | to 1st rdg as amen | |
2011-03-15 | Rpt out amen | |
2011-03-10 | to 14th Ord | |
2011-03-10 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-24 | to Jud | |
2011-02-24 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-24 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-23 | to Senate | |
2011-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-1-1 | |
2011-02-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-18 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-18 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-11 | to Jud | |
2011-02-11 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-10 | to printing | |
2011-02-10 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-10 | House intro |