ID H0129 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2015 Session Law Chapter 180 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2015 Session Law Chapter 180 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES - Amends existing law to provide an exception to a prohibition of operation of certain vehicles and motorbikes on controlled access highways, to provide that the Idaho Transportation Board may designate sections of state highways over which specified vehicles and motorbikes may travel and to provide that specified vehicles and motorbikes may travel upon and cross certain portions of non-full access-controlled state highways unless closed.
Title
Amends existing law to provide an exception to a prohibition of operation of certain vehicles and motorbikes on controlled access highways, to provide that the Idaho Transportation Board may designate sections of state highways over which specified vehicles and motorbikes may travel and to provide that specified vehicles and motorbikes may travel upon and cross certain portions of non-full access-controlled state highways unless closed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2015 Session Law Chapter 180 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-19 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-04 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-04 | House | PASSED -- 65-0-5 |
2015-03-04 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2015-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |