ID H0126 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Take bill off General Orders; referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Take bill off General Orders; referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VOTING -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding voter registration and voter identification.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding voter registration and voter identification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Take bill off General Orders; referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-20 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2023-03-17 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |