ID H0123 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTORCYCLES -- Adds to existing law to provide that law enforcement shall not engage in motorcycle profiling.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that law enforcement shall not engage in motorcycle profiling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Ret’d to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read third time in full -- FAILED 13-22-0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-27 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2017-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |