ID H0113 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to property tax to delete provisions relating to procedures associated with county assessors' approval, modification or disapproval of certain claims for property tax reduction and procedures relating to action by the County Board of Equalization associated with such claims; to revise provisions relating to the time in which the property tax reduction roll shall be certified to the county auditor and to the State Tax Commission; to revise the time in which claimants shall have to make written protest to the tax commission relating to the commission's intent to disapprove all or a portion of a claim; and to revise the time in which the tax commission shall have to provide written notice of disapproval to a claimant or a person or entity acting on behalf of the claimant.
Title
Amends existing law relating to property tax to delete provisions relating to procedures associated with county assessors' approval, modification or disapproval of certain claims for property tax reduction and procedures relating to action by the County Board of Equalization associated with such claims; to revise provisions relating to the time in which the property tax reduction roll shall be certified to the county auditor and to the State Tax Commission; to revise the time in which claimants shall have to make written protest to the tax commission relating to the commission's intent to disapprove all or a portion of a claim; and to revise the time in which the tax commission shall have to provide written notice of disapproval to a claimant or a person or entity acting on behalf of the claimant.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-15 | Delivered to Governor on 03/14 | |
2011-03-14 | To Governor | |
2011-03-11 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-10 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-10 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-09 | To enrol | |
2011-03-08 | to House | |
2011-03-08 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-03 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-16 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-02-16 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-16 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-15 | to Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 66-1-3 | |
2011-02-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-10 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-10 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-08 | to Rev/Tax | |
2011-02-08 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-07 | to printing | |
2011-02-07 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-07 | House intro |